Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Milner

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Castabala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1752Born
21 Dec 177624.1Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
6 Mar 180350.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
6 Mar 180350.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castabala
22 May 180350.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castabala
19 Apr 182673.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Milner (VIAF: 7484337)
Bishop John Milner (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Midland District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolborn, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Church, Winchester, Hampshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceLongbirch, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Buried Place (Original)Giffard House, Brewood, Stafford, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District, England
Buried Place (Current)Sts. Peter and Paul, Church, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Archdiocese of Birmingham, England

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 12
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 139
  • bp/op/od: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 152
  • opd: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast