Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Westminster

Archidioecesis Vestmonasteriensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 29 September 1850
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: England
  • Region: Great Britain
  • Square Kilometers: 3,634 (1,403 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprising: Greater London boroughs north of the Thames and west of Waltham Forest and Newham, plus the districts of Staines and Sunbury-on-Thames, and the county of Hertfordshire.
  • Official Web Site: http://www.rcdow.org.uk/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, Ambrosden Avenue, Westminster, London SW1P 1QJ, England, Great Britian
  • Telephone: (020)7798-9033
  • Fax: 7798-9077

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of England
1622ErectedVicariate Apostolic of England (erected)
30 January 1688Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District (erected)
30 January 1688Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of Midland District (erected)
30 January 1688Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of Western District (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of London District
30 January 1688Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of England Vicariate Apostolic of London District
29 September 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of London District Diocese of Southwark (erected)
Archdiocese of Westminster
29 September 1850ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of London District Archdiocese of Westminster
20 July 1917Territory LostArchdiocese of Westminster Diocese of Brentwood (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Westminster
1949315,0004,518,4897.0%4312767074453702,500164ap1951
1970484,6804,491,76010.8%4314311,124208ap1971
1980476,3784,468,40010.7%3034727756146472216ap1981
1990449,1914,520,0009.9%39444483853655861,842215ap1991
1999460,0004,415,00010.4%37839277059745071,394213ap2000
2000501,8954,435,00011.3%41638480062745891,396214ap2001
2001501,9004,435,00011.3%37040177165045921,322214ap2002
2002462,0724,435,00010.4%36340376660345881,310214ap2003
2003430,0004,420,0009.7%34840575357145701,201214ap2004
2004465,5874,613,28410.1%34539874362645521,194214ap2005
2010476,6474,726,20610.1%366263629757103561,109216ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 Jun 2014