Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Challoner

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Doberus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Sep 1691Born
9 Mar 171624.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of London District, England, Great Britain
28 Mar 171624.4Ordained PriestPriest of London District, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 173947.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
12 Sep 173947.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Doberus
29 Jan 174149.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Doberus
22 Sep 175866.9SucceededVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
12 Jan 178189.2DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Richard Challoner (VIAF: 54166109)
Bishop Richard Challoner (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiddingly, Lewes, Sussex, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopHammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death Place25 Gloucester Street, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)St. Blaise, Church, Milton, Abingdon, Berkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)Most Precious Blood, Cathedral, Westminster, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 64.7 years
  • a bishop for 39.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 64, and Page 65
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1741, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 198, and Page 454
  • od/op/c01: CB, 16 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast