Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventure Giffard

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Madaurus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642²Born
1667²25.0Ordained PriestPriest
25 Nov 168745.8SelectedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 168846.0ConfirmedVicar Apostolic of Midland District, England, Great Britain
28 Jan 168846.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Madaurus
22 Apr 168846.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Madaurus
14 Mar 170361.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
12 Mar 173492.1DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventure Giffard (VIAF: 47114192)
Bishop Bonaventure Giffard (born 1642, died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChillington Hall, Longbirch, Wolverhampton, Staffordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of England (and Wales)
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopWhitehall Palace, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceHammersmith, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)Old St. Pancras Churchyard, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,406
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 97
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 106, and Page 252
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1688, Number 5
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 21 Jan 2018