Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Cardinal d’Adda

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1650BornMilano, Italy
3 Mar 168736.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
3 Mar 168736.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Great Britain
1 May 168736.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
13 Feb 169039.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
13 Feb 169039.4Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169645.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
16 Apr 171463.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
21 Jan 171564.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
27 Jan 171968.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando d’Adda:
Cardinal Ferdinando d’Adda (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Feb 1690

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013