Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcos de Ostos, O. de M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Salerno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1644³BornEcija, Spain
25 Jun 169248.1AppointedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
30 Jun 169248.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Salerno, Italy
19 Nov 169551.5DiedArchbishop of Salerno, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcos de Ostos:
Archbishop Marcos de Ostos O. de M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Salerno

  • a bishop for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 340
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 233, Number 1,451
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015