Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Pecci

Deceased

Bishop of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1671³BornSiena
5 Dec 170635.5Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 171039.5AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
28 Dec 171039.6Ordained BishopBishop of Grosseto, Italy
1 Jun 173665.0DiedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Pecci:
Bishop Bernardino Pecci (born , died ) Bishop of Grosseto

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1736
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 213
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015