Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fulvio Cardinal Astalli

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1655BornSambuco, Italy
2 Sep 168631.0Elevated to Cardinal
30 Sep 168631.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
17 May 168832.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
19 Oct 168934.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
19 Feb 171054.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
7 May 171054.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
16 Apr 171458.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
13 May 171458.7Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
26 Apr 171963.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
14 Jan 172165.4DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

MicroData Summary for Fulvio Astalli:
Fulvio Cardinal Astalli (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a bishop for 6.6 years
  • a cardinal for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686
  • c34: CB, 19 Jun 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 11
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,443

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015