Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Porzio

Deceased

Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Aug 1655BornPositani
16 Jan 169539.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
23 Jan 169539.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Apr 171862.6AppointedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
18 Apr 171862.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy
Nov 1719³64.1DiedBishop of Cariati e Cerenzia, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Porzio:
Bishop Bartolomeo Porzio (born , died Nov 1719) Bishop of Cariati e Cerenzia

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015