Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agostino Nicola degl’Abbati Olivieri, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Porphyreon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Dec 1661BornPesaro
22 Dec 168524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
13 Jun 171452.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Targa
15 Jul 171452.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Targa
16 Jun 172159.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon
29 Jan 173169.1DiedTitular Bishop of Porphyreon

MicroData Summary for Agostino Nicola degl’Abbati Olivieri:
Bishop Agostino Nicola degl’Abbati Olivieri O.S.A. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Porphyreon

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1728
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • c34: CB, 18 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015