Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Mariconda, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1671BornNapoli
18 Dec 169423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
12 Jul 171745.8AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
18 Jul 171745.8Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
2 Sep 173058.9SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
11 Dec 173059.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
9 Feb 173765.3DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Mariconda:
Archbishop Alfonso Mariconda O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 19 Sep 2013