Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Prospero Cardinal Marefoschi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1653BornMonte Santo della Marca, Italy
1 Jun 171157.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cyrene
7 Jun 171157.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cyrene
3 Feb 172167.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Caesarea in Cappadocia
20 Dec 172471.2Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jan 172571.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
19 Nov 172572.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
20 Sep 172875.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
24 Feb 173278.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

MicroData Summary for Prospero Marefoschi:
Prospero Cardinal Marefoschi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite

  • a bishop for 20.7 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1724
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 21 Jul 2014