Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Marín (Marino), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Siracusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1673BornEnguera, Spain
2 Mar 169724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Feb 172451.0AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
20 Feb 172451.0Ordained BishopBishop of Siracusa, Italy
2 May 173057.2DiedBishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tomás Marín (Marino):
Bishop Tomás Marín (Marino) O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Siracusa

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 156

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013