Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tommaso Cervini

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1663Born
7 Dec 171047.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Oct 171652.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
11 Oct 171652.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Heraclea in Europa
20 Apr 171753.5AppointedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Feb 172157.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicomedia
20 May 172157.5ResignedVicegerent of Roma {Rome}, Italy
27 Mar 173470.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
29 Jul 175187.7DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Cervini
Patriarch Tommaso Cervini (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontepulciano

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 218, and Page 288
  • c34: CB, 27 May 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1716, Number 27
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,448
  • vice: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 14 Aug 2021

Quantcast