Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Odierna, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1680BornNapoli
22 Apr 169817.5ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Aug 170322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
17 Mar 172746.4AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
25 Mar 172746.5Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
Jun 1735³54.7DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Matteo Odierna:
Bishop Matteo Odierna O.S.B. (born , died Jun 1735) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 31.7 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 404
  • ob/c34: CB, 25 Jan 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015