Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

Dioecesis Latinensis-Terracinensis-Setinus-Privernensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Mariano Crociata, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Diocese of Roma {Rome}
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,371 (529 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Lazio
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesi.latina.it/
  • Mailing Address: Via Sezze 16, 04100 Latina, Italia
  • Telephone: 0773.69.42.61
  • Fax: 0773.66.81.60

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Terracina
1st CenturyErectedDiocese of Terracina (erected)
Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
17 January 1217UnitedDiocese of Priverno (or Piperno)
Diocese of Sezze
Diocese of Terracina
Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
Diocese of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze
12 September 1967Name ChangedDiocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze Diocese of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze
Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze
1950109,800110,00099.8%6032921,1933913532ap1951
Diocese of Terracina-Latina, Priverno e Sezze
1966105,750106,00099.8%4741881,2014319533ap1971
1980254,010257,35098.7%89571461,7396128981ap1981
Diocese of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno
1990275,000290,00094.8%86601461,88316428184ap1991
1999282,717297,59795.0%93701631,73437528587ap2000
2000283,820298,75895.0%90701601,77337528587ap2001
2001285,607300,63995.0%83701531,86677628487ap2002
2002288,278303,45195.0%83651481,94777125087ap2003
2003298,397304,48798.0%91651561,91256927087ap2004
2004299,380305,49098.0%86651511,98256928087ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Dec 2013