Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Baccarini, C. R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Capua, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1881Born
24 Sep 190423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Resurrection of Our Lord Jesus Christ
7 Mar 192240.5AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
21 May 192240.7Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
30 Jun 193048.8AppointedArchbishop of Capua, Italy
13 Feb 196280.5DiedArchbishop of Capua, Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Baccarini
Archbishop Salvatore Baccarini C. R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Capua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLanuvio

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018