Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tommaso Trussoni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza

Titular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1856BornCampodolcino di Chiavenna
8 Mar 187922.5Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 191256.3AppointedArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
5 Jan 191356.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
9 Apr 193477.6RetiredArchbishop of Cosenza, Italy
9 Apr 193477.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
21 Dec 194084.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cosenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Trussoni:
Archbishop Tommaso Trussoni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cosenza

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015