Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Poletti

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1860Born
28 Aug 191252.2AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
29 Sep 191252.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
17 Dec 191858.6DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Poletti
Bishop Emilio Poletti (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTirano
Ordained BishopMenaggio
Death PlaceBagnoregio, Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1912, Number 64
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 33, Number 1,955

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast