Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlo Castelli, Obl.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Fermo, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Congr. degli Oblati di S. Carlo di Milano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1863Born
19 Sep 188522.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Nov 190441.6AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
7 Dec 190441.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 Dec 190542.7InstalledBishop of Bobbio, Italy
14 Jul 190643.3AppointedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
8 Dec 190643.7InstalledArchbishop of Fermo, Italy
1929²65.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ancona e Numana, Italy
19 Jul 193168.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Ancona e Numana, Italy
8 Feb 193369.8DiedArchbishop of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Carlo Castelli
Archbishop Carlo Castelli Obl.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop of Fermo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGorla Minore, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceFermo, Archdiocese of Fermo
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Fermo, Archdiocese of Fermo

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,904, Number 68
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88
  • aadm/loc: AM, 29 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast