Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Bignami

Deceased

Archbishop of Siracusa, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1862Born
9 Nov 188422.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
11 Dec 190543.4AppointedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
14 Jan 190643.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy
27 Dec 191957.4DiedArchbishop of Siracusa, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Bignami
Archbishop Luigi Bignami (born , died ) Archbishop of Siracusa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 13.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1920
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1906, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 9 Oct 2020

Quantcast