Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Massimiliano Massimiliani

Deceased

Bishop of Modigliana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jun 1876Born
20 Sep 190226.2Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jun 193155.0AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
15 Aug 193155.1Ordained BishopBishop of Modigliana, Italy
30 Aug 196084.1DiedBishop of Modigliana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Massimiliano Massimiliani
Bishop Massimiliano Massimiliani (born , died ) Bishop of Modigliana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFalerone

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,931, Number 44
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 746, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast