Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Maria Cipriani

Deceased

Bishop of CittÓ di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1878BornGalatina
3 Mar 190122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fermo, Italy
29 Sep 193456.1AppointedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
8 Dec 193456.3Ordained BishopBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy
8 Oct 195678.2DiedBishop of CittÓ di Castello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Cipriani:
Bishop Filippo Maria Cipriani (born , died ) Bishop of CittÓ di Castello

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1934, Number 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013