Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Petrelli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Peru

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1873BornMontegiorgio, Italy
10 Aug 189623.5Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 191037.2AppointedBishop of Lipa, Philippines
12 Jun 191037.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lipa, Philippines
30 May 191542.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Philippines
30 May 191542.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
27 May 192148.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
24 Dec 192653.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Peru
29 Apr 196289.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Peru

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Petrelli:
Archbishop Giuseppe Petrelli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Peru

  • a priest for 65.7 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014