Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago Caragnan Sancho

Deceased

Archbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1880Born
4 Oct 190323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
5 Feb 191736.7AppointedBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
29 Jun 191737.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tuguegarao, Philippines
22 Apr 192746.9AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
29 Jun 195171.0AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Oct 196686.3DiedArchbishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Santiago Caragnan Sancho
Archbishop Santiago Caragnan Sancho (born , died ) Archbishop of Nueva Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLibmanan

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 49.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1917, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast