Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesar Marie Guerrero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Fernando

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1885BornLa Ermita
28 Oct 191429.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 Feb 192944.1AppointedBishop of Lingayen, Philippines
24 May 192944.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lingayen, Philippines
16 Dec 193752.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manila, Philippines
16 Dec 193752.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Limisa
14 May 194964.3AppointedBishop of San Fernando, Philippines
14 Mar 195772.1ResignedBishop of San Fernando, Philippines
14 Mar 195772.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
28 Mar 196176.2DiedBishop Emeritus of San Fernando, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Cesar Marie Guerrero:
Bishop Cesar Marie Guerrero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Fernando

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013