Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John MacEvilly

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1818Born
25 Jul 184022.2Ordained PriestPriest of Tuam, Ireland
9 Jan 185738.7AppointedBishop of Galway, Ireland
22 Mar 185738.9Ordained BishopBishop of Galway, Ireland
31 Aug 186648.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kilmacduagh, Ireland
31 Aug 186648.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kilfenora, Ireland
11 Jan 187859.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Tuam, Ireland
7 Nov 188163.5SucceededArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
26 Nov 190284.6DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John MacEvilly (VIAF: 122039929)
Archbishop John MacEvilly (born , died ) Archbishop of Tuam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLouisburgh
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tuam, Archdiocese of Tuam

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 282, and Page 570
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017