Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John MacHale

Deceased

Archbishop of Tuam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1791BornTubbernavine
1814²22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Killala, Ireland
8 Mar 182534.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Killala, Ireland
8 Mar 182534.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
5 Jun 182534.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
27 May 183443.2SucceededBishop of Killala, Ireland
8 Aug 183443.4AppointedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland
7 Nov 188190.6DiedArchbishop of Tuam, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John MacHale (VIAF: 67412557)
Archbishop John MacHale (born , died ) Archbishop of Tuam

  • a priest for 67.8 years
  • a bishop for 56.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 68, and Page 253
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 380
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 4 Dec 2016