Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Burke

Deceased

Bishop of Elphin, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1779²Born
1802²23.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
1803²24.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jan 181940.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Elphin, Ireland
12 Jan 181940.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
27 Jun 181940.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Augustopolis in Phrygia
8 May 182748.3SucceededBishop of Elphin, Ireland
16 Sep 184364.7DiedBishop of Elphin, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Burke
Bishop Patrick Burke (born 1779, died ) Bishop of Elphin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisnageeragh
Ordained BishopMaynooth College
Buried Place (Original)Family Vault, Cemetery, Kilcroan

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 24.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 95, and Page 185
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 22
  • bd/bp/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 13
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 80, Number 6,517
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 86, Number 7,167

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast