Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kyran Marum

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1773Born
26 May 179522.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ossory, Ireland
1 Apr 179724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ossory, Ireland
4 Oct 181441.5AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
5 Mar 181541.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
22 Dec 182754.7DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Kyran Marum
Bishop Kyran Marum (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGalmoy, Co. Kilkenny
Ordained PriestEpicurean Palace
Buried Place (Original)Old, Cathedral

  • a priest for 30.7 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1815, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 293
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 82

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast