Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Keating

Deceased

Bishop of Ferns


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1783BornCoolnahorna
11 Jun 180825.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ferns, Ireland
1809¹26.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
12 Jan 181936.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ferns, Ireland
12 Jan 181936.0AppointedTitular Bishop of AntinoŽ
9 Mar 181936.1SucceededBishop of Ferns, Ireland
21 Mar 181936.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland
7 Sep 184966.6DiedBishop of Ferns, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Keating (VIAF: 315619068)
Bishop James Keating (born 1783, died ) Bishop of Ferns

  • a priest for 40.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 79, and Page 193
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1819, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Jun 2016