Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Haly

Deceased

Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1787¹BornDoonan Colliery
10 Jan 183851.0AppointedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
25 Mar 183851.2Ordained BishopBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland
19 Aug 185568.6DiedBishop of Kildare and Leighlin, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francis Haly
Bishop Francis Haly (born 1787, died ) Bishop of Kildare and Leighlin

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 228
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016