Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis (William) Whelan, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bombay

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1798BornDublin, Ireland
4 Oct 181719.2ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
7 Jun 184243.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
7 Jun 184243.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
3 Jul 184244.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Lydia
5 Jan 184849.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
4 Aug 185052.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Bombay, India
13 Dec 187678.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bombay, India

MicroData Summary for John Francis (William) Whelan:
Bishop John Francis (William) Whelan O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Bombay

  • a bishop for 34.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013