Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Moore

Deceased

Bishop of Ballarat, Australia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1832Born
27 Jun 187846.3Ordained PriestPriest of Melbourne, Australia
22 Jan 188451.9AppointedBishop of Ballarat, Australia
27 Apr 188452.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ballarat, Australia
26 Jun 190472.3DiedBishop of Ballarat, Australia

MicroData Summary for James Moore
Bishop James Moore (born , died ) Bishop of Ballarat

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewton Sands, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
Ordained BishopS. Patrick, Cathedral, Ballarat, Diocese of Ballarat

  • a priest for 25.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 139
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 78
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017