Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Daniel Murphy

Deceased

Archbishop of Hobart


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1815BornCrookstown (Cork), Ireland
8 Feb 183822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Dublin, Ireland
16 Dec 184530.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madras, India
16 Dec 184530.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
11 Oct 184631.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
20 May 185135.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Hyderabad, India
14 Nov 186550.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Hobart, Australia
21 Jan 186650.6SucceededBishop of Hobart, Australia
3 May 186650.9InstalledBishop of Hobart, Australia
3 Aug 188873.1AppointedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia
29 Dec 190792.5DiedArchbishop of Hobart, Australia

MicroData Summary for Daniel Murphy:
Archbishop Daniel Murphy (born , died ) Archbishop of Hobart

  • a priest for 69.9 years
  • a bishop for 61.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,003
  • b/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 110, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • bp/bd/op/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 309
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013