Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas William Croke

Deceased

Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1823³Born
26 May 184724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Cloyne and Ross, Ireland
23 Jun 187047.4AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
10 Jul 187047.5Ordained BishopBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
25 Jun 187451.4ResignedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
25 Jun 187552.4AppointedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland
22 Jul 190279.5DiedArchbishop of Cashel (-Emly), Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas William Croke (VIAF: 88731492)
Archbishop Thomas William Croke (born , died ) Archbishop of Cashel (-Emly)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastlecor Demesne
Ordained BishopSte Agathe des Irlandais, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 55.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130, and Page 188
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Apr 2017