Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Coffey

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1836Born
6 Jun 186529.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Aug 188953.6AppointedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
10 Nov 188953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
14 Apr 190468.2DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for John Coffey (VIAF: 315613394)
Bishop John Coffey (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerry, Diocese of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, Killarney

  • a priest for 38.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017