Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartholomew Woodlock

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

Titular Bishop of Trapezopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1819Born
18 Dec 184122.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Apr 187960.0AppointedBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
1 Jun 187960.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
21 Jan 189575.8RetiredBishop of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland
12 Feb 189575.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Trapezopolis
13 Dec 190283.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois), Ireland

MicroData Summary for Bartholomew Woodlock (VIAF: 315694745)
Bishop Bartholomew Woodlock (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ardagh (and Clonmacnois)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Archdiocese of Dublin
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 60.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 118, and Page 562
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 19 Apr 2017