Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessandro Cardinal Sanminiatelli Zabarella

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1840BornRadicondoli, Italy
6 Sep 186323.1Ordained PriestPriest of Pisa, Italy
31 Jul 187434.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
15 Aug 187434.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
19 Jun 189958.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
22 Jun 189958.9AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
15 Apr 190160.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190160.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
24 Nov 191070.3DiedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Sanminiatelli Zabarella:
Cardinal Alessandro Sanminiatelli Zabarella (born , died ) Titular Patriarch of Constantinople

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
  • a cardinal for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 224, and Page 573
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jun 1899

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 10 Jan 2014