Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ercole Vincento Boffi

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1829Born
28 Dec 185223.7Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 188455.0AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
6 Apr 188455.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
16 May 189667.1DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercole Vincento Boffi (VIAF: 88796858)
Bishop Ercole Vincento Boffi (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSezze
Ordained BishopS. Marcel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 139
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017