Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cosimo Barnaba Cardinal Corsi

Deceased

Archbishop of Pisa, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1798Born
1821¹22.5Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 184243.6Elevated to Cardinal
27 Jan 184243.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
20 Jan 184546.6AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
26 Jan 184546.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
19 Dec 185355.5AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
7 Oct 187072.3DiedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cosimo Barnaba Corsi (VIAF: 25401461)
Cosimo Barnaba Cardinal Corsi (born , died ) Archbishop of Pisa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze
Death PlaceAgnano
Buried Place (Original)Rmi. Cappellani of the University, Agnano
Buried Place (Current)Cathedral, Pisa, Archdiocese of Pisa
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
  • a cardinal for 28.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 455
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 61
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 4
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 24 Jan 1842

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016