Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Marie Alli Maccarani

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1810Born
2 Mar 183322.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Miniato, Italy
30 Nov 185444.6AppointedBishop of San Miniato, Italy
3 Dec 185444.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Miniato, Italy
10 Apr 186353.0DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Marie Alli Maccarani
Bishop Francesco Marie Alli Maccarani (born , died ) Bishop of San Miniato

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Miniato
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 30.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,854, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast