Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Micara, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1775BornFrascati, Italy
Dec 1798²23.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
9 Mar 182448.4AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Dec 182449.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
13 Mar 182650.4Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 182650.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
1830²54.2ResignedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
2 Oct 183761.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 Oct 183762.0Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
28 Nov 184368.1AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
1 May 184468.5AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Ceremonies
17 Jun 184468.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
24 May 184771.6DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Micara (VIAF: 89060787)
Ludovico Cardinal Micara O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.6 years
  • a cardinal for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 33
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 20 Dec 1824

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016