Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Soglia Ceroni

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1779BornCasola Valsenio, Italy
1 Jan 180323.2Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182647.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
22 Oct 182647.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ephesus
23 Jun 183454.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Studies
6 Apr 183555.5AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
12 Feb 183858.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
18 Feb 183959.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quattro Coronati
18 Feb 183959.4AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
18 Feb 183959.4Elevated to Cardinal
4 Jun 184868.7AppointedSecretary of State
12 Aug 185676.8DiedSecretary of State

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Soglia Ceroni:
Cardinal Giovanni Soglia Ceroni (born , died ) Secretary of State

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 98, and Page 161
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 188
  • ob/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Feb 1839

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013