Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni-Benedetto Folicaldi

Deceased

Bishop of Faenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1801BornBagnacavallo
17 Apr 182423.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Apr 182423.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jul 183231.2AppointedBishop of Faenza, Italy
8 Jul 183231.3Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza, Italy
28 May 186766.1DiedBishop of Faenza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni-Benedetto Folicaldi (VIAF: 88938093)
Bishop Giovanni-Benedetto Folicaldi (born , died ) Bishop of Faenza

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 192
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1832, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Jul 2016