Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Frezza

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

Titular See: (Nuncio/Nueva Granada)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1783Born
11 Jun 180825.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 182643.3AppointedBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
19 Nov 182643.4Ordained BishopBishop of Terracina, Priverno e Sezze, Italy
15 Dec 182845.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Chalcedon
15 Dec 182845.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
23 Jun 183451.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
11 Jul 183653.1Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jul 183653.1ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
21 Nov 183653.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
14 Oct 183754.3DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

MicroData Summary for Luigi Frezza (VIAF: 89064644)
Luigi Cardinal Frezza (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCivita Lavinia, Suburbicarian See of Albano, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 29.3 years
  • a bishop for 10.9 years
  • a cardinal for 3.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 147, and Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1826, Number 44
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 Jun 1834
  • x933: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast