Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Innocenzo Castracane degli Antelminelli

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1780Born
24 Sep 180322.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jan 183453.0AppointedBishop of Cervia, Italy
24 Feb 183453.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cervia, Italy
12 Feb 183857.1AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
Jun 1848³67.4DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Innocenzo Castracane degli Antelminelli
Bishop Innocenzo Castracane degli Antelminelli (born , died Jun 1848) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,834
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,845
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 124, and Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,834, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast