Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ludovico Tevoli

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1772BornMorlupo, Italy
17 Dec 183260.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
23 Dec 183260.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
17 Oct 185684.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Athenae

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Tevoli
Archbishop Ludovico Tevoli (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Athenae

  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1832, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016