Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Sisto Cardinal Riario Sforza

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1810BornNaples
1 Sep 183322.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
12 Apr 184534.4SelectedBishop of Aversa, Italy
24 Apr 184534.4ConfirmedBishop of Aversa, Italy
25 May 184534.5Ordained BishopBishop of Aversa, Italy
6 Sep 184534.8SelectedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
24 Nov 184535.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
19 Jan 184635.1Elevated to Cardinal
19 Jan 184635.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
29 Sep 187766.8DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Sisto Riario Sforza:
Cardinal Sisto Riario Sforza (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.3 years
  • a cardinal for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 100, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013