Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonardo Moccia

Deceased

Bishop of Gallipoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1801BornTorre Santa Susanna
20 Dec 182322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Jun 182422.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 184846.9SelectedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
11 Dec 184847.1ConfirmedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
4 Mar 184947.3Ordained BishopBishop of Gallipoli, Italy
17 Apr 185250.4DiedBishop of Gallipoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Leonardo Moccia:
Bishop Leonardo Moccia (born , died ) Bishop of Gallipoli

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 3.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 280
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013